OR HB3267 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes governing body of Malheur County, under specified circumstances, to plan and zone site for industrial use, in addition to and not in lieu of other authority to plan and zone for industrial use.
Title
Relating to industrial use of land in Malheur County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-28 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 7--Bailey, Barton, Dembrow, Komp, Tomei, Unger, Williamson. |
2013-06-28 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-06-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2013-04-24 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules. |
2013-04-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Land Use. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |