OR HB3265 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Liquor and Cannabis Commission to conduct study of feasibility of reporting transactions electronically and each quarter, rather than each month. Directs Oregon Liquor and Cannabis Commission to conduct study of feasibility of reporting transactions electronically and each quarter, rather than each month.
Title
Relating to reports to the Oregon Liquor and Cannabis Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Small Business. |
2023-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |