OR HB3264 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Chapter 662, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Chapter 662, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes pilot program for purpose of assisting students with disabilities to make transition into life after high school.
Title
Relating to assisting students with disabilities to make transition into life after high school; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | Chapter 662, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013. |
2013-07-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed. Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Boquist. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Parrish. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Smith. |
2013-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-06-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-18 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-07 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |