OR HB3263 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to identify cost and feasibility of implementing recommendations of study on recruitment, retention, mentoring and professional development of educators who serve students from student groups that may be at risk for experiencing achievement gap. Directs Department of Education to identify cost and feasibility of implementing recommendations of study on recruitment, retention, mentoring and professional development of educators who serve students from student groups that may be at risk for experiencing achievement gap. Directs department to submit findings to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2024. Sunsets January 2, 2025. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to educators who serve students from student groups at risk of experiencing achievement gap; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Education. |
2023-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |