OR HB3261 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 216, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 216, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies requirement to record interview with person under 18 years of age to include custodial interviews conducted inside law enforcement facility by peace officer, school resource officer or special campus security officer of investigations into misdemeanors, felonies and acts that, if committed by adult, would constitute misdemeanors or felonies. Modifies requirement to record peace officer's] interview with person under 18 years of age to include custodial interviews conducted inside law enforcement facility by peace officer, school resource officer or special campus security officer of investigations into misdemeanors, felonies and acts that, if committed by adult, would constitute crimes and require recorded interviews whenever person under 18 years of age would reasonably believe person is in custody] misdemeanors or felonies. Requires recording of custodial interviews with person under 18 years of age conducted outside of law enforcement facility if officer is wearing video camera. Creates exceptions.
Title
Relating to law enforcement interviews of persons under 18 years of age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 216, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Carried over to 05-23 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Carried over to 05-22 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 6--Barker, Barreto, Findley, McLane, Reschke, Wilson; Excused, 2--Nearman, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Nathanson. |
2019-04-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 24, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |