OR HB3256 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Connecting Oregon Libraries Fund. Directs Public Utility Commission to study laws related to telecommunications and provide results to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022.] Sunsets January 2, 2023.] Establishes Connecting Oregon Libraries Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to State Library for purpose of providing matching funds for federal moneys received by certain libraries for providing broadband access. Requires State Library Board to adopt certain rules before distributing moneys in fund. Directs Public Utility Commission, in consultation with certain other state agencies, to investigate and make recommendations on feasibility of expanding Oregon Telephone Assistance Program and applying residential service surcharge to support access to broadband internet access service or other telecommunication services. Requires commission to submit report to appropriate interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to telecommunications; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to Economic Recovery and Prosperity. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |