OR HB3252 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 146, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Excludes, for limited duration, certain employees of Oregon State Police from meaning of supervisory employee for purposes of public employment. Excludes, for limited duration, certain employees of Oregon State Police from meaning of supervisory employee for purposes of public employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to employment classification of certain employees of Oregon State Police.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseChapter 146, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
2019-05-22HouseGovernor signed.
2019-05-16SenatePresident signed.
2019-05-16HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-05-15SenateThird reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters.
2019-05-14SenateCarried over to 05-15 by unanimous consent.
2019-05-13SenateSecond reading.
2019-05-13SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2019-05-07SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-02SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-23SenateReferred to Workforce.
2019-04-22SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-04-18HouseThird reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Nearman, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 2--Barreto, Marsh.
2019-04-17HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2019 Calendar.
2019-04-16HouseSecond reading.
2019-04-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-04-08HouseWork Session held.
2019-04-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2019-03-04HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback