OR HB3251 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Oregon Business Development Department to award matching grants to membership organizations and business accelerators in outdoor gear and apparel industry. Authorizes Oregon Business Development Department to make loans and] award matching grants to membership organizations and business accelerators in outdoor recreation] gear and apparel industry. Declares emergency, effective on passage.].
Title
Relating to the outdoor recreation industry.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] |
Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Cheri Helt [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] |
Sen. Chuck Thomsen [R] | Rep. Duane Stark [R] | Rep. Joseph Zika [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Golden [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |