OR HB3244 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Chapter 249, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Chapter 249, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Department of Human Services to recommend policies to integrate system of services and support for runaway and homeless youth who are 0 through 17 years of age and for youth who are 18 through 20 years of age who continue to be or who become homeless.
Title
Relating to support services for youth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | House | Chapter 249, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014. |
2013-05-28 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-05-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Shields. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Beyer. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-04-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Boone. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2013-04-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 23, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-18 | House | Second reading. |
2013-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |