OR HB3231 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes State Board of Sign Language Interpreters within Oregon Health Authority. Establishes State Board of Sign Language Interpreters within Oregon Health Authority. Directs board to issue licenses to qualified applicants to provide signed language interpretation services. Allows board to impose discipline and civil penalties not to exceed $10,000 for violations of Act. Punishes violations by maximum of 30 days' imprisonment, $1,250 fine, or both. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to sign language interpreters; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3231 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3231/Introduced |