OR HB3231 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes governing bodies of cities and counties to jointly form district for purposes of acquisition, design, construction, reconstruction, installation, operation, maintenance and repair of limited-access public highway projects within district boundaries. Specifies powers of district. Provides civil penalty and collection mechanism for failure to pay toll established by limited-access public highway project district on tollway project. Requires county that receives application for limited-access public highway project submitted by limited-access public highway district to review and approve application subject only to standards for construction of highways as prescribed by Department of Transportation. Prohibits county from denying application based on finding that project is inconsistent with local intergovernmental agreement or law limiting use or development of land designated rural reserve.
Title
Relating to public highway projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Armand Vial [R] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] | Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Sen. Brian Boquist [R] |
Sen. Mark Hass [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to Transportation Policy. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB3231 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3231/Introduced |