OR HB3221 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Chapter 537, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 31, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Removes federal forest reserve revenues from list of revenues that are considered Local Revenues for purposes of State School Fund distributions to school districts. Increases amounts of moneys that are not considered Local Revenues for purposes of State School Fund distributions to school districts.] Removes federal forest reserve revenues from list of revenues that are considered Local Revenues for purposes of State School Fund distributions to school districts. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the calculation of Local Revenues for the purpose of State School Fund distributions; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Revenue, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-15HouseChapter 537, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 31, 2023.
2023-07-31HouseGovernor signed.
2023-06-29SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-24SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Anderson.
2023-06-24SenateThird reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 8--Anderson, Bonham, Findley, Girod, Knopp, Robinson, Smith DB, Weber; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Thatcher.
2023-06-23SenateSecond reading.
2023-06-23SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2023-06-22SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-06-21SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session cancelled.
2023-06-15SenateReferred to Finance and Revenue.
2023-06-15SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2023-06-08HouseThird reading. Carried by Smith G. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 3--Levy B, Morgan, Owens; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Wallan, Speaker Rayfield.
2023-06-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2023 Calendar.
2023-06-07HouseSecond reading.
2023-06-02HouseSubsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
2023-06-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
2023-06-01HouseWork Session held.
2023-05-31HouseWork Session held.
2023-05-24HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-05-10HouseInformational Meeting held.
2023-04-19HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-03-01HouseReferred to Revenue by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
2023-03-01HouseWithout recommendation as to passage, be referred to Revenue, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2023-02-27HouseWork Session held.
2023-02-09HouseReferred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2023-02-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB3221
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3221/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3221/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3221/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3221/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24778
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25079
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25182
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25207
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74748
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/73957
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74623
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74821
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/262474
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/262758
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/262652
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270621
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270982
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271047
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271052
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271102
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273211
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274412
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274537
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80013
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274945
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274946
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80088
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80089
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275162
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275301
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275302
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275303
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80163
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80219
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276272
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276273
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276293
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80821
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276350
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276352
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276357
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80923
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34362
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35953
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=585205
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36311
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=590216

Bill Comments

feedback