OR HB3221 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Grants Public Utility Commission authority to authorize Oregon Renewable Options Programs offered by qualified utilities. Establishes Oregon Renewable Options Program.] Grants Public Utility Commission authority to authorize Oregon Renewable Options Programs offered by qualified utilities. Becomes operative January 1, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to renewable electricity; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Rep. Vikki Breese-Iverson [R] |
Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Rep. Anna Williams [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. Lynn Findley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-06-11 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2021-04-09 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to Water with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |