OR HB3220 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-24 - Chapter 259, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions of electronics recycling program. Modifies provisions of electronics recycling program. Expands definition of covered electronic device. Establishes criteria for electronics producer responsibility programs. Repeals requirement that Department of Environmental Quality establish state contractor program. Repeals requirement that department make certain calculations used in administration of program. Directs Environmental Quality Commission to establish fee calculated to cover costs to department of carrying out program. Establishes that changes to program become operative on July 1, 2025] January 1, 2026. Provides transition provisions. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to electronics recycling; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-24HouseChapter 259, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
2023-07-13HouseGovernor signed.
2023-06-24SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-22SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Knopp.
2023-06-22SenateThird reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 1--Girod; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher.
2023-06-21SenateCarried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-20SenateCarried over to 06-21 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-16SenateCarried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-15SenateSecond reading.
2023-06-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2023-05-09SenateWork Session held.
2023-04-18SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-04-13SenatePublic Hearing Cancelled.
2023-03-24SenateReferred to Energy and Environment.
2023-03-23SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2023-03-22HouseThird reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Goodwin, Levy E, Reschke, Smith G.
2023-03-21HouseRules suspended. Carried over to March 22, 2023 Calendar.
2023-03-20HouseSecond reading.
2023-03-17HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2023-03-13HouseWork Session held.
2023-03-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-09HouseReferred to Climate, Energy, and Environment.
2023-02-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB3220
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3220/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3220/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3220/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3220/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/22813
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/22991
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75512
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75988
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74011
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75594
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75741
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264043
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263638
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264681
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264416
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264626
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270776
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271159
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272965
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79302
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34542
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=565553
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35620
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=588778

Bill Comments

feedback