OR HB3220 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to study feasibility of creating automatic process to set aside certain convictions for possession of controlled substances, and to provide results of study to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than December 31, 2021. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to study feasibility of creating automatic process to set aside certain convictions for possession of controlled substances, and to provide results of study to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than December 31, 2021. Sunsets January 2, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to setting aside convictions; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3220 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3220/Introduced |