OR HB3220 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission to conduct study and develop recommendations on how to ensure students have greatest practicable opportunity to transfer credits earned at community colleges to baccalaureate degrees awarded at public universities. Requires commission to submit report detailing recommendations by December 31, 2017. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to transfer of academic credit; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Rep. John Huffman [R] | Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] |
Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB3220 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3220/Introduced |