OR HB3219 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits finding of unfitness, for purpose of terminating parental rights, based solely on emotional illness, mental illness, intellectual or developmental disability or other disability.
Title
Relating to termination of parental rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-08 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2013-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |