OR HB3218 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 31, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 17, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 31, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 17, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expands allowable uses for Housing and Community Services Department's manufactured dwelling programs to support dwellings and parks destroyed by natural disaster. Expands allowable uses for Housing and Community Services Department's manufactured dwelling programs to support dwellings and parks destroyed by natural disaster. Allows department to contract for administration of manufactured dwelling replacement loans. Removes cap on loans per individual. Adjusts cap on department's manufactured dwelling decommissioning and disposal grants. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to manufactured dwellings; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Lily Morgan [R] | Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D] | Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] |
Sen. David Smith [R] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Golden [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 31, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 17, 2021. |
2021-05-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 21; Absent, 1--Boquist; Excused, 8--Anderson, Beyer, Burdick, Heard, Johnson, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 46; Excused, 14--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Clem, Grayber, Hayden, Levy, Nearman, Owens, Pham, Reynolds, Wallan, Williams, Zika. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |