OR HB3218 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 31, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 17, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expands allowable uses for Housing and Community Services Department's manufactured dwelling programs to support dwellings and parks destroyed by natural disaster. Expands allowable uses for Housing and Community Services Department's manufactured dwelling programs to support dwellings and parks destroyed by natural disaster. Allows department to contract for administration of manufactured dwelling replacement loans. Removes cap on loans per individual. Adjusts cap on department's manufactured dwelling decommissioning and disposal grants. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to manufactured dwellings; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-25HouseChapter 31, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 17, 2021.
2021-05-17HouseGovernor signed.
2021-05-12SenatePresident signed.
2021-05-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-05-07SenateThird reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 21; Absent, 1--Boquist; Excused, 8--Anderson, Beyer, Burdick, Heard, Johnson, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen.
2021-05-06SenateSecond reading.
2021-05-06SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-04-22SenateWork Session held.
2021-04-20SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-15SenateReferred to Housing and Development.
2021-04-12SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-10HouseThird reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 46; Excused, 14--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Clem, Grayber, Hayden, Levy, Nearman, Owens, Pham, Reynolds, Wallan, Williams, Zika.
2021-04-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-08HouseCarried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-06HouseCarried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-05HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar.
2021-03-31HouseCarried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-30HouseSecond reading.
2021-03-25HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-03-23HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-16HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-02HouseReferred to Housing.
2021-02-23HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3218
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3218/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3218/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3218/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3218/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31507
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=514777
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32122
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=520151

Bill Comments

feedback