OR HB3218 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Chapter 114, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Chapter 114, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits time during which Appraiser Certification and Licensure Board may commence disciplinary proceedings. Modifies statute of limitations for actions arising out of real estate appraisal activity and appraisal review.
Title
Relating to real estate appraisal.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Holvey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Chapter 114, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Girod, Winters. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Wallan; Excused, 2--Keny-Guyer, Piluso. |
2019-04-01 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |