OR HB3217 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes contractor liable for unpaid wages, including other benefit payment or contribution, of employee of subcontractor at any tier. Permits third party owed payment or contribution made as part of employee compensation and joint labor-management cooperation committee to bring action against contractor on behalf of employee for unpaid wages. Requires committee to provide notice of intent to file action to contractor and subcontractor. Requires subcontractor at any tier to provide certain information to contractor upon request. Requires contracts entered into between contractors and first-tier subcontractors or between first-tier subcontractors and subcontractors at any tier to include certain provisions to ensure timely payments of wages to employees. Allows contractor to pay unpaid wages to employee of subcontractor and to withhold payment to subcontractor in amount equal to amount of unpaid wages for subcontractor's failure to meet certain requirements. Applies to contractors who enter into contract with subcontractor on or after January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to wages of employees of subcontractors.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2019-02-28HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback