OR HB3217 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Department of State Lands to adopt pilot program for voluntary stream restoration and beaver recovery through construction of artificial beaver dams. Requires Department of State Lands to adopt pilot program for providing general authorization] for voluntary stream restoration and beaver recovery through construction of artificial beaver dams. Requires department to establish by rule removal or fill general permit for participants to construct artificial beaver dams. Prescribes requirements for pilot program. Requires department to report on program to Legislative Assembly on or before January 1, 2025. Sunsets program January 2, 2027. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to artificial beaver dams; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-06SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2015-06-17SenateReferred to Rules by order of the President.
2015-06-17SenateRecommendation: Do Pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.)
2015-06-03SenateWork Session held.
2015-05-27SenateWork Session held.
2015-05-18SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-05-08SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources.
2015-05-04SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-04-30HouseThird reading. Carried by Clem. Passed.Ayes, 51; Nays, 7--Buckley, Gomberg, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Lininger, Taylor; Excused, 2--Boone, Nathanson.
2015-04-29HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 30, 2015 Calendar.
2015-04-28HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 29, 2015 Calendar.
2015-04-27HouseSecond reading.
2015-04-24HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2015-04-21HouseWork Session held.
2015-03-31HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-03-05HouseReferred to Rural Communities, Land Use, and Water.
2015-02-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB3217
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3217/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3217/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3217/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3217/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3217/B-Engrossed
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/22021
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=347215
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/22902

Bill Comments 750

feedback