OR HB3216 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - Referred to Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to conduct study on persons released from local correctional facilities due to circumstances caused by COVID-19 and to provide results of study to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than May 31, 2022. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to conduct study on persons released from local correctional facilities due to circumstances caused by COVID-19 and to provide results of study to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than May 31, 2022. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to release from incarceration; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-26HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-02-23HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback