OR HB3215 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes ombudsman for early childhood care and education providers. Establishes ombudsman for early childhood care and education providers. Prescribes duties of ombudsman.
Title
Relating to Early Learning Division ombudsman.
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] |
Rep. Anna Williams [D] | Sen. Deb Patterson [D] | Sen. Charles Riley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to Early Childhood with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3215 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3215/Introduced |