OR HB3208 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds processor to types of entities from which taxpayer engaged in farming operation may obtain certification stating percentage of in-state agricultural commodity sold to entity, in order to determine taxpayer's commercial activity for purposes of corporate activity tax. Adds processor to types of entities from which taxpayer engaged in farming operation may obtain certification stating percentage of in-state agricultural commodity sold to entity, in order to determine taxpayer's commercial activity for purposes of corporate activity tax. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to determination of commercial activity of taxpayer engaged in farming operation; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3208 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3208/Introduced |