OR HB3207 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 675, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 675, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that portion of Interstate 5 shall be known as Atomic Veterans Memorial Highway.
Title
Relating to the Atomic Veterans Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Rep. Sherrie Sprenger [R] | Sen. Fred Girod [R] | Rep. Jeff Barker [D] | Rep. Brian Clem [D] |
Rep. Sal Esquivel [R] | Rep. Mike McLane [R] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. Andy Olson [R] |
Rep. Bill Post [R] | Rep. Jennifer Williamson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 675, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-08-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Boquist, Linthicum. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-07-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Barker, Nosse, Smith DB, Smith Warner. |
2017-07-01 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-06-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-27 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-27 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-04-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |