OR HB3206 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates tax credit for taxpayer located in qualifying county who establishes and implements employee training program in collaboration with local community college. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2017. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax credits; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-06-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reschke. Passed.Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Greenlick; Excused, 1--Hayden. |
2017-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |