OR HB3198 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Early Learning Division and Department of Human Services to jointly conduct study on employment-related child care and to report results of study to appropriate interim committee of Legislative Assembly. Directs Early Learning Division and Department of Human Services to jointly conduct study on employment-related child care and to report results of study to appropriate interim committee of Legislative Assembly. Sunsets December 31, 2021. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to employment-related child care; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to Early Childhood. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3198 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3198/Introduced |