OR HB3194 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes self-service dispensing of Class 1 flammable liquids at retail dispensary.
Title
Relating to the dispensing of Class 1 flammable liquids.
Sponsors
Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Sen. Dallas Heard [R] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] |
Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Werner Reschke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3194 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3194/Introduced |