OR HB3194 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Chapter 649, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Modifies sentences imposed for felony marijuana offenses and for driving while suspended.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to crime; appropriating money; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-25HouseChapter 649, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013.
2013-07-25HouseGovernor signed.
2013-07-06SenatePresident signed.
2013-07-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2013-07-01SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski,Winters. Passed. Ayes, 19; nays, 11--Baertschiger, Bates, Close, George, Girod, Johnson, Knopp, Olsen, Starr, Thomsen, Whitsett.
2013-06-29SenateSecond reading.
2013-06-29SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2013-06-28SenateReferred to Public Safety.
2013-06-28SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2013-06-27HouseThird reading. Carried by Olson, Garrett. Passed. Ayes, 40; Nays, 18--Barton, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Fagan, Freeman, Gorsek, Hanna, Johnson, Kennemer, McLane, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant; Excused, 2--Thatcher, Whitsett.
2013-06-26HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 27, 2013 Calendar.
2013-06-25HouseSecond reading.
2013-06-25HouseSubsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
2013-06-25HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
2013-06-24HouseWork Session held.
2013-04-05HousePublic Hearing held.
2013-04-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2013-02-22HouseReferred to Public Safety with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2013-02-22HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback