OR HB3193 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 444, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 444, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Commissioner of Bureau of Labor and Industries to notify Construction Contractors Board of valid wage claim filed against contractor or business subject to licensing by board. Requires Commissioner of Bureau of Labor and Industries to notify Construction Contractors Board of valid wage claim filed against contractor or business who is] subject to licensing by board. Requires commissioner to notify board if order of determination has become final and if contractor fails to pay construction debt] unpaid wages within certain time period after date on which order became final unless motion to stay order is pending or has been granted by commissioner. Requires that, for employers that are contractors or businesses licensed by board, order of determination must include statement that failure to pay construction debt] wage claim and any penalties shall result in commissioner notifying board of such failure and board's suspension of contractor's] license. Requires board, after notice and opportunity for hearing, to suspend license of contractor or business. Permits board to use notification of final order to take certain disciplinary actions against businesses and owners, officers or responsible managing individual of businesses licensed by board. Provides that business owner who becomes subject to certain penalties and bond requirements while operating business remains responsible for such penalties and bond requirements when business owner ceases operation of business.] Allows wage claimant to recover unpaid wages from contractor's bond or by obtaining final order issued by Bureau of Labor and Industries. Increases amount that nonowner complainant may recover from bond in certain circumstances. Increases cap on amount of moneys that may be paid from Wage Security Fund to wage claimant.
Title
Relating to wages.
Sponsors
Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Paul Holvey [D] |
Rep. Kimberly Wallan [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 444, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Sprenger. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Thatcher declared potential conflict of interest by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Heard. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Carried over to 05-23 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Carried over to 05-22 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Keny-Guyer, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Smith Warner, Williamson. |
2019-04-03 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |