OR HB3187 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Chapter 532, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Chapter 532, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes individuals who possess relevant technical experience and are employed seven or more years by certain types of districts, and certain types of registered professionals, eligible to apply for certification as water right examiners. Makes individuals who possess relevant technical experience and are employed seven or more years by certain types of districts, and certain types of registered professionals, eligible to apply for certification as water right examiners. Sunsets eligibility for certain individuals to apply for certification on July 1, 2027.
Title
Relating to water right examiners.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. James Hieb [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-23 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-15 | House | Chapter 532, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024. |
2023-07-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 49; Nays, 5--Cate, Chaichi, Gamba, Nelson, Wallan; Excused, 6--Diehl, Elmer, Morgan, Nguyen H, Reschke, Wright. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Knopp. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 24; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Carried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Carried over to 06-21 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-03-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Owens. Passed. Ayes, 46; Nays, 8--Chaichi, Gamba, Holvey, Nelson, Pham K, Sanchez, Sosa, Walters; Excused, 5--Dexter, Evans, Javadi, Nguyen D, Nguyen H; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Boshart Davis. |
2023-03-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 27, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-03-22 | House | Second reading. |
2023-03-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2023-03-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-02 | House | Referred to Agriculture, Land Use, Natural Resources, and Water. |
2023-02-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |