OR HB3182 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - At President's desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - At President's desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Incorporates certain provisions of federal Indian Child Welfare Act into Oregon laws relating to youth offenders adjudicated for status offenses and to voluntary adoptions. Directs Department of Human Services to study and make recommendations on provisions of state law relating to adoption of Indian children. Requires department to submit report on findings to interim committee of Legislative Assembly by January 1, 2023.] Incorporates certain provisions of federal Indian Child Welfare Act into Oregon laws relating to youth offenders adjudicated for status offenses and to voluntary adoptions. Enhances state protections for Indian children in certain situations. Authorizes juvenile court to approve tribal customary adoption as permanency option for wards who are Indian children. Modifies court process to determine whether there is reason to know child is Indian child. Makes technical corrections to child welfare laws involving Indian children. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to Indian children; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | At President's desk upon adjournment. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Hudson, Leif, Nearman, Smith G. |
2021-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |