OR HB3182 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires permit for construction, installation or operation of onsite nonpotable water system. Requires permit for construction, installation or operation of system for on-site treatment and reuse of nonpotable water] onsite nonpotable water system. Requires Environmental Quality Commission to adopt by rule risk-based water quality standards for on-site treatment and reuse of nonpotable water] onsite nonpotable water system. Becomes operative January 1, 2020. Authorizes commission to take certain actions before operative date of Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to onsite nonpotable water systems; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Karin Power [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] |
Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2019-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |