OR HB3181 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Utility Notification Center to adopt rules requiring paint used for marking underground facilities to be temporary marking paint or other industry-accepted low-impact marking and requiring operators to remove markings that continue to be visible on private property after reasonable period has passed since excavation is complete. Requires Oregon Utility Notification Center to adopt rules requiring paint used for marking underground facilities to be temporary marking paint or other industry-accepted low-impact marking and requiring operators to remove markings that continue to be visible on private property after reasonable period has passed since excavation is complete. Provides that operators that do not remove markings in compliance with rules are responsible to private property owners for all costs associated with damages caused to private property in process of removing markings.
Title
Relating to underground facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Leif [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3181 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3181/Introduced |