OR HB3180 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies allocation formula for grants to regional assessment centers and community assessment centers. Establishes Child Abuse Assessment Account within State Treasury for purpose of grant program for assessment centers. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Justice for purpose of funding program. Modifies authority of Advisory Council on Child Abuse Assessment to deposit contributions to Child Abuse Multidisciplinary Intervention Account and Child Abuse Assessment Account. Directs Department of Human Services to distribute $1 million to Center for Prevention of Abuse and Neglect to conduct Oregon Child Abuse Prevalence Study. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Human Services for distribution. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Education for purposes of developing curricula and providing educator training for instructional requirements that relate to child sexual abuse prevention, human sexuality education, teen dating violence and domestic violence, and similar instructional requirements that relate to child safety. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to child safety; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |