OR HB3179 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Human Services to distribute $1 million to Center for the Prevention of Abuse and Neglect to conduct Oregon Child Abuse Prevalence Study. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Human Services for distribution. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to collecting data on child abuse; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-04-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-04-08HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2019-02-28HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback