OR HB3177 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Limits types of restrictions that Governor may impose on certain businesses during state of emergency related to COVID-19 pandemic. Limits types of restrictions that Governor may impose on certain businesses during state of emergency related to COVID-19 pandemic. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to emergency restrictions on businesses; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 21 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-26HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2021-05-06HouseMotion to withdraw from Economic Recovery and Prosperity failed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 35--Bynum, Campos, Clem, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Pham, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Reynolds, Ruiz, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Valderrama, Wilde, Williams, Witt; Excused, 4--Alonso Leon, Nearman, Noble, Salinas.
2021-02-25HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-16HouseReferred to Economic Recovery and Prosperity with subsequent referral to Rules.
2021-02-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback