OR HB3176 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires vehicle dealer to submit notice of sale or transfer of vehicle to Department of Transportation if vehicle dealer sells vehicle to another vehicle dealer. Provides that department may make notation on its records indicating that it has received notification that interest in vehicle has been transferred only if form submitted contains all information required by department. Makes person that abandons vehicle responsible for abandonment of vehicle and liable for costs of towing and disposing of abandoned vehicle. Modifies notice content to parties interested in abandoned vehicles. Requires authority requesting tow to provide certain information to person who tows vehicle. Requires motor vehicle liability insurance policy to provide coverage for towing expenses related to motor vehicle accident.
Title
Relating to vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Sen. Dallas Heard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3176 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3176/Introduced |