OR HB3176 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Shortens time person must wait before petitioning court or applying to Department of Transportation to restore revoked driving privileges.
Title
Relating to driving privileges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |