OR HB3174 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits court from allowing public display or public disclosure of images of person in state of nudity, except pursuant to court order entered after showing of good cause. Prohibits court from allowing public display or public disclosure of images of person in state of nudity, except pursuant to court order entered after showing of good cause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to images of person in state of nudity.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-26HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2021-03-25HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-12HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-02-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback