OR HB3173 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-9)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes requirement that amount of net proceeds from Oregon State Lottery allocated to County Fair Account not exceed $1.53 million annually. Removes requirement that amount of net proceeds from Oregon State Lottery allocated to County Fair Account not exceed $1.53 million annually. Requires Oregon Business Development Department to prepare and report master plan for county fairground capital construction. Specifies content and procedural requirements for report. Appropriates moneys to department out of General Fund for consultant services related to report. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021. .

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to county fairs; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-02HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-04-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-03-30HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-25HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-16HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2021-02-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback