OR HB3169 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Water Resources Department to conduct study to determine certain information regarding aquifers in this state. Requires department to report findings to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than November 30, 2015] 2020. Requires department to establish loan program for financing drilling, repair, rehabilitation or deepening of] specified activities regarding wells used for domestic purposes. Establishes fund for use in carrying loan program. Authorizes issuance of lottery bonds during biennium beginning July 1, 2015, and allocates bond proceeds to fund. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to water; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to Rural Communities, Land Use, and Water. |
2015-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |