OR HB3166 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes certain findings and declarations concerning water budgets and water use data. Requires Legislative Policy and Research Committee to study and make recommendations to interim committee of Legislative Assembly regarding water measurement program.] Sunsets January 2, 2023.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.] Makes certain findings and declarations concerning water budgets and water use data. Directs Water Resources Commission to designate certain number of water basins or subbasins as priority basins and take certain other actions concerning water use data and water budgets. Directs commission to undertake review concerning water measurements. Directs commission to develop water budgets for priority water basins. Directs commission to report to committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to water on or before September 15, 2022, concerning water measurements review. Directs commission to report to committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to water on or before January 1, 2026, on progress in designating priority water basins, developing water budgets and assessing certain questions. Directs Water Resources Department to require persons that hold water rights to conduct measurement and reporting of duty of water diverted, appropriated or stored under water right, subject to certain exceptions. Directs department to use moneys in Water Measurement Cost Share Program Revolving Fund to offset costs of complying with requirements. Provides that person's reporting, without other evidence of nonuse or partial nonuse, may not be used for certain legal or administrative purposes. Authorizes commission to impose civil penalty for violation of water use measurement or reporting requirements, subject to certain exceptions.
Title
Relating to water.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-19 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to Water. |
2021-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |