OR HB3165 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases minimum percentage of funding that school districts must provide to public charter schools for students enrolled in kindergarten through grade eight if 50 percent or more of students are from population that is historically underserved. Increases minimum percentage of funding that school districts must provide to public charter schools for students enrolled in kindergarten through grade eight if 50 percent or more of students are from population that is historically underserved. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to additional funding for students from historically underserved populations when calculating State School Fund distributions; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Kotek [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3165 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3165/Introduced |