OR HB3163 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 128, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 128, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amends residency requirements for purposes of licenses, tags and permits related to wildlife. Amends residency requirements for purposes of licenses, tags and permits related to wildlife.
Title
Relating to residency requirements under wildlife statutes.
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Witt [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Rep. Werner Reschke [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 128, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Thatcher. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Clem, Levy. |
2021-04-14 | House | Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-30 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2021-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |