OR HB3160 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 175, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 25, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 175, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 25, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits persons who have limited vision to carry and use white canes on highways and in other public places. Defines "limited vision." Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the use of white canes; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 175, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 25, 2017. |
2017-05-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Boone, Greenlick, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Olson. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Carried over to 05-11 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Doherty, Piluso. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Lewis. |
2017-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |