OR HB3159 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Chapter 691, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 29, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Chapter 691, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 29, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permits counties and cities to set maximum rates for towing and related services when tower tows motor vehicle without consent or authorization of owner or operator.
Title
Relating to charges for towing motor vehicle; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-29 | House | Chapter 691, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 29, 2013. |
2013-07-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 42; Nays, 15--Bentz, Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Jenson, Johnson, Krieger, Sprenger, Thompson, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Bailey, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2013-07-01 | House | Vote reconsideration carried. Ayes, 39; Nays, 18--Bentz, Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Jenson, Johnson, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Sprenger, Thompson, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Bailey, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2013-06-28 | House | Hoyle changed vote from "aye" to "nay" and served notice of possible reconsideration. |
2013-06-28 | House | Motion to concur in Senate amendments and repass bill failed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 18--Bentz, Berger, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hicks, Hoyle, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, Olson, Parrish, Sprenger, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused for Business of the House, 16--Barker, Buckley, Frederick, Freeman, Hanna, Huffman, Jenson, Komp, McLane, Nathanson, Read, Richardson, Smith, Tomei, Williamson, Speaker Kotek. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 4--George, Girod, Kruse, Olsen. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Carried over to 06-27 by unanimous consent. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill. (Printed C-Eng.) |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Motion to refer to Rules carried on voice vote. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Motion to reconsider carried on voice vote. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Rosenbaum changed his vote from "aye" to "nay" and serve notice of possible reconsideration. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Beyer. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Bill failed. Ayes, 13; nays, 16--Baertschiger, Beyer, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Monroe, Olsen, Rosenbaum, Starr, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-04-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lively. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 25--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Jenson, Kennemer, Krieger, McKeown, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett. |
2013-04-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 25, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-22 | House | Second reading. |
2013-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-04-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency. |
2013-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |