OR HB3158 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 174, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 174, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires State Fish and Wildlife Commission to implement program to encourage reporting of wildlife law violations.
Title
Relating to incentives for reporting wildlife law violations.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike McLane [R] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] | Rep. Sal Esquivel [R] | Rep. Werner Reschke [R] |
Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Sherrie Sprenger [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 174, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Boquist, Linthicum, Thatcher. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLane. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Alonso Leon, Boone, Gorsek, Smith G. |
2017-04-20 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |