OR HB3155 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 164, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 03, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 164, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 03, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires cities within Metro with population greater than 10,000 to conduct housing needs analysis. Requires cities within Metro with population greater than 10,000 to conduct housing needs analysis. Replaces requirement that Metro allocate housing capacity among those cities with requirement that cities amend their land use regulations and housing production strategy if analysis shows housing need. Provides optional process for housing production strategy and buildable lands and housing needs analysis for any city with population of 10,000 or less. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to residential land use planning by local governments within urban growth boundaries; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 164, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 03, 2021. |
2021-06-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Heard, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral. Referred to Housing and Development by order of the President. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 46; Excused, 14--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Clem, Grayber, Hayden, Levy, Nearman, Owens, Pham, Reynolds, Wallan, Williams, Zika. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |